This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/15/2019 at 15:46:22 (UTC).

CHAMBORD PROPERTY MANAGEMENT VS SHORT, RAQUEL

Case Summary

On 10/17/2012 CHAMBORD PROPERTY MANAGEMENT filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SHORT, RAQUEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, San Pedro Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1015

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Pedro Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHAMBORD PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

Defendants

SHORT RAQUEL

DODSON DENNIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

REAL, VINCENT

REAL VINCENT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2012
  • RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S. WRIT WHOLLY RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S. WRIT WHOLLY UNSATISFIED AS TO POSSESSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2012
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2012
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2012
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2012
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING *** DEFAULT PROCESSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FOR ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2012
  • DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO CCP 415.46 DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO CCP 415.46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2012
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2012
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-20 MIN(S) * * REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2012
  • MEMO TO SET REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2012
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED Filing Fee: 240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2012
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less