Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/30/2017 at 13:05:43 (UTC).

CHALLENGE FINANCIAL SERVICES INC A CORP VS JOSE MANUEL VASQUEZ

Case Summary

On 10/27/2017 CHALLENGE FINANCIAL SERVICES INC A CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JOSE MANUEL VASQUEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Covina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN J. TOWNSEND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1557

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Covina Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SUSAN J. TOWNSEND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHALLENGE FINANCIAL SERVICES INC A CORP

Defendant

VASQUEZ JOSE MANUEL

 

Court Documents

Unknown

11/27/2017: Unknown

Unknown

10/27/2017: Unknown

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Challenge Financial Services Inc A Corp (Plaintiff); As to: Jose Manuel Vasquez (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/18/2017; Service Cost: 35.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/19/2017 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Challenge Financial Services Inc A Corp (Plaintiff); As to: Jose Manuel Vasquez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Susan J. Townsend in Department 6 West Covina Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHALLENGE FINANCIAL SERVICES INC is a litigant