This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/19/2019 at 01:09:08 (UTC).

CERRITOS NISSAN VS EDDIE PEREZ

Case Summary

On 08/09/2018 CERRITOS NISSAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against EDDIE PEREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3900

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CERRITOS NISSAN

Cerritos, CA 90703

Defendant

PEREZ EDDIE

Norwalk, CA 90650

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

2/13/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

10/17/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

10/22/2018: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]

12/20/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]

Notice (name extension) - Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT

12/20/2018: Notice (name extension) - Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/13/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

2/13/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/13/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

2/13/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/13/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

10/17/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

8/9/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2019
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Cerritos Nissan against Defendant Eddie Perez on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Cerritos Nissan on 08/09/2018 for the principal amount of $300.00 and costs of $115.00 for a total of $415.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Cerritos Nissan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/13/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/13/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 02/13/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Cerritos Nissan (Plaintiff); Eddie Perez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Case reassigned to Bellflower Courthouse in Department 1 - Hon. Carol Rose; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Updated -- 02/13/2019 Non-Jury Trial: Location changed from Department SE2 to Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Cerritos Nissan (Plaintiff); As to: Eddie Perez (Defendant); Service Cost: 85.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 10/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/13/2019 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Cerritos Nissan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/17/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 02/13/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/17/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 10/17/2018; Result Type to Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion; Result Type from Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion to Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Cerritos Nissan (Plaintiff); As to: Eddie Perez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/17/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less