This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2019 at 01:13:15 (UTC).

CERRITOS NISSAN VS BRYAN JACOB CURIEL

Case Summary

On 08/09/2018 CERRITOS NISSAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BRYAN JACOB CURIEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3905

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CERRITOS NISSAN

Cerritos, CA 90703

Defendant

CURIEL BRYAN JACOB

Whittier, CA 90602

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/18/2019

3/18/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/18/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

3/18/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/13/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/13/2019

2/13/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/13/2019

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

2/13/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

8/9/2018: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

10/17/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice (name extension) - Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT

12/20/2018: Notice (name extension) - Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]

12/20/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

10/17/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

8/9/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2019
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Cerritos Nissan on 08/09/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/18/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/18/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 03/18/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/18/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • On the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/13/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 03/18/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Cerritos Nissan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/13/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Cerritos Nissan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2018
  • Updated -- 02/13/2019 Non-Jury Trial: Location changed from Department SE2 to Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/13/2019 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Cerritos Nissan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/17/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 10/17/2018; Result Type to Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion; Result Type from Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion to Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/17/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 02/13/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Cerritos Nissan (Plaintiff); As to: Bryan Jacob Curiel (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/17/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less