This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/15/2020 at 18:49:17 (UTC).

CENTRAL PLAZA, LLC VS JEROME CAVADA

Case Summary

On 01/27/2020 CENTRAL PLAZA, LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against JEROME CAVADA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GAIL KILLEFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0980

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GAIL KILLEFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CENTRAL PLAZA LLC

Defendant

CAVADA JEROME

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHO DIANA

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

3/24/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 03/24/2020

3/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 03/24/2020

Application for Order to Post - Application for Order to Post

2/27/2020: Application for Order to Post - Application for Order to Post

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

1/29/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Jerome Cavada)

1/29/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Jerome Cavada)

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

1/27/2020: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/27/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/27/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

1/27/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/27/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2020
  • Hearing06/29/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department Civil Cler at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/29/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 03/24/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/06/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Held - Continued was rescheduled to 06/29/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Application for Order to Post: Filed By: Central Plaza, LLC (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 02/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketApplication for Order to Post; Signed and Filed by: Central Plaza, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Jerome Cavada (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/06/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gail Killefer in Department 97 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Central Plaza, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Jerome Cavada (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Central Plaza, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Jerome Cavada (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Central Plaza, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Jerome Cavada (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CENTRL PLAZA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHO DIANA