Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/24/2021 at 19:55:56 (UTC).

CELESTE CABRERA VS ALEXIS MEJIA

Case Summary

On 10/28/2020 CELESTE CABRERA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALEXIS MEJIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2482

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CABRERA CELESTE

Defendant

MEJIA ALEXIS

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/07/2021

1/7/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/07/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

1/7/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

12/31/2020: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

10/28/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/07/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Celeste Cabrera on 10/28/2020, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/07/2021 at 03:00 PM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 01/07/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Alexis Mejia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/07/2021 at 03:00 PM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Celeste Cabrera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Celeste Cabrera (Plaintiff); As to: Alexis Mejia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketCase assigned in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less