This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/07/2020 at 17:22:41 (UTC).

CECILIA ELIAS, AS GUARDIAN AT LITEM FOR WILLIAM LOPEZ JR., A MINOR VS RICHARD RODRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 06/04/2019 CECILIA ELIAS, AS GUARDIAN AT LITEM FOR WILLIAM LOPEZ JR , A MINOR filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RICHARD RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5381

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELIAS AS GUARDIAN AT LITEM FOR WILLIAM LOPEZ JR. A MINOR CECILIA

Defendant

RODRIGUEZ RICHARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KALANTAR ART

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise)

3/9/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise)

Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account - Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

3/9/2020: Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account - Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgm

3/9/2020: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgm

Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Pro

3/9/2020: Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Pro

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

3/13/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 12/19/2019

12/19/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 12/19/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

12/19/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Pro

9/30/2019: Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Pro

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for William

7/26/2019: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for William

Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing - Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing for Guardian ad litem re: William

6/14/2019: Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing - Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing for Guardian ad litem re: William

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/4/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

6/4/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/4/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/01/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/07/2022 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Cecilia Elias, as Guardian at litem for William Lopez Jr., a minor on 06/04/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Cecilia Elias, as Guardian at litem for William Lopez Jr., a minor as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 99 on [ln 28, col 22] with Document:76659753

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketAddress for Art Kalantar (Attorney) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketExpedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person with a Disability (Miscellaneous); Filed by: Cecilia Elias, as Guardian at litem for William Lopez Jr., a minor (Plaintiff); As to: Richard Rodriguez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketOrder Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous); Filed by: Cecilia Elias, as Guardian at litem for William Lopez Jr., a minor (Plaintiff); As to: Richard Rodriguez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous): Status changed from Filed to Signed and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketOrder to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account; Filed by: Cecilia Elias, as Guardian at litem for William Lopez Jr., a minor (Plaintiff); As to: Richard Rodriguez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account: Status changed from Filed to Signed and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for William: Status Date changed from 06/04/2019 to 06/14/2019; As To Parties changed from Richard Rodriguez (Defendant) to Cecilia Elias, as Guardian at litem for William Lopez Jr., a minor (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for William - Rejected; Submitted by: Cecilia Elias, as Guardian at litem for William Lopez Jr., a minor (Plaintiff); As to: Cecilia Elias, as Guardian at litem for William Lopez Jr., a minor (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/01/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Cecilia Elias, as Guardian at litem for William Lopez Jr., a minor (Plaintiff); As to: Richard Rodriguez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Cecilia Elias, as Guardian at litem for William Lopez Jr., a minor (Plaintiff); As to: Richard Rodriguez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for William: Status Date changed from 06/14/2019 to 06/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for William: Status Date changed from 06/14/2019 to 06/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC05381    Hearing Date: March 09, 2020    Dept: 26

Elias v. Rodriguez, et al.

EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISES

OF PENDING ACTION ON BEHALF OF MINOR

(CRC 7.950.5(c)(1))

TENTATIVE RULING:

Amended Expedited Petition of Cecilia Elias to Approve Compromise of Pending Action on Behalf of Minor Plaintiff William Lopez, Jr. is GRANTED.

ANALYSIS:

On June 4, 2019, minor Plaintiff William Lopez, Jr. (“Claimant”), by and through his Guardian Ad Litem Cecilia Elias (“Petitioner”) filed the instant action for motor vehicle negligence against Defendant Richard Rodriguez (“Defendant”). Petitioner was appointed as Claimant’s guardian ad litem on July 26, 2019. Petitioner filed an Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action (the “Petition”) on behalf of Claimant on September 30, 2019. On December 19, 2019, having reviewed the Expedited Petition, the Court found it to be incomplete. Specifically, the Petition did not provide “all doctors’ reports containing a diagnosis of and prognosis for the claimant’s injures, and a report of the claimant’s present condition,” as required. (Pet., filed 9/30/19, ¶10.) The Court ordered the Expedited Petition set for hearing on March 9, 2020.

On February 19, 2020, Petitioner filed an amended Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action (the “Amended Petition”), which the Court now reviews. Having reviewed the Petition, the Court finds it to be complete and provides for a reasonable settlement to minor Plaintiff based on his injuries and prognosis. Proposed orders have been filed concurrently.

Therefore, the Amended Expedited Petition of Cecilia Elias to Approve Compromise of Pending Action on Behalf of Minor Plaintiff William Lopez, Jr. is GRANTED.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.