This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/27/2017 at 11:04:44 (UTC).

CCV PARTNERSHIP II VS. SIMPSON, ARTHENS

Case Summary

On 12/16/2016 CCV PARTNERSHIP II filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SIMPSON, ARTHENS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5709

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CCV PARTNERSHIP II A CALIF . LTD PARTNERSHIP

Defendants

SIMPSON ARTHENS

SEWELL NNEKA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANDELBAUM & ROBISON LLP - JOSEPH L. CRUZ ESQ

Attorney at MANDELBAUM & ROBISON LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2017
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (CCV PARTNERSHIP II) A CALIF . LTD PARTNERSHIP FOR REJECTION OF DISMISSAL- THERE IS A JUDGMENT ON RECORD, PLEASE REVIEW. SUBMITTED ON 01/19/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (SIMPSON, ARTHENS) , (SEWELL, NNEKA) , ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IN POSSESSION .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (SIMPSON, ARTHENS) . COSTS OF $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (SEWELL, NNEKA) . COSTS OF $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (SIMPSON, ARTHENS) , (SEWELL, NNEKA) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP; DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 01/13/17 , FOR (CCV PARTNERSHIP II) A CALIF . LTD PARTNERSHIP , AGAINST (SIMPSON, ARTHENS) , (SEWELL, NNEKA) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 26814 N ISABELLA PKWY #201 SANTA CLARITA, CA 91351 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN PAS523985015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON 06/19/17 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPARTMENT NEA . .

    Read MoreRead Less