This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/11/2020 at 12:00:20 (UTC).

COMPUTER DIRECT, INC. VS RED APPLE CALIFORNIA LLC

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 COMPUTER DIRECT, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RED APPLE CALIFORNIA LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5079

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CCOMPUTER DIRECT INC.

COMPUTER DIRECT INC.

Defendant

RED APPLE CALIFORNIA LLC

Not Classified By Court

CHEN KOO HSIU JEN

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/23/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

12/6/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/14/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Computer Direct, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Computer Direct, Inc. on 12/06/2019, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Computer Direct, Inc. as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Red Apple California LLC (Defendant) to Red Apple California LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Computer Direct, Inc. (Plaintiff): Organization Name changed from Ccomputer Direct, Inc. to Computer Direct, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • Docket** Case Name changed from CCOMPUTER DIRECT, INC. vs RED APPLE CALIFORNIA LLC to COMPUTER DIRECT, INC. vs RED APPLE CALIFORNIA LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Computer Direct, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Hsiu Jen Chen Koo (Non-Party); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/19/2019; Service Cost: 110.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/14/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase assigned in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Ccomputer Direct, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Red Apple California LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less