This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/10/2021 at 02:04:57 (UTC).

CBL SERVICES, LLC., A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS OROKING INTERNATIONAL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/19/2020 CBL SERVICES, LLC , A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against OROKING INTERNATIONAL, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GRACIELA FREIXES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4127

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GRACIELA FREIXES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CBL SERVICES LLC. A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

OROKING INTERNATIONAL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

FARIDNIA FARSHID AKA FARSHID FARDINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DIX LLOYD DOUGLAS

BEMIS GARY A.

Defendant Attorney

HESS MATTHEW E.

 

Court Documents

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Gary A Bemis in support of filing of Substitution of Attorney without prior counsel signature

5/18/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Gary A Bemis in support of filing of Substitution of Attorney without prior counsel signature

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

5/20/2021: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Opposition (name extension) - Opposition Declaration of Matthew E. Hess in Opposition to Ex Parte Application

6/22/2021: Opposition (name extension) - Opposition Declaration of Matthew E. Hess in Opposition to Ex Parte Application

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

6/24/2021: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

6/25/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

11/20/2020: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

11/17/2020: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Answer - Answer

8/27/2020: Answer - Answer

Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

8/28/2020: Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/15/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/15/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/20/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Complaint - Complaint

6/19/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/19/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/19/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/19/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/19/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

6/19/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • Hearing01/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Settlement: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 01/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal After Settlement scheduled for 08/11/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/25/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 06/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal After Settlement scheduled for 08/11/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: CBL SERVICES, LLC., a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); OSC re: Dismissal Date: 01/31/2022; Vacate Future Dates: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketEx-parte Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial scheduled for 06/23/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: CBL SERVICES, LLC., a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: FARSHID FARIDNIA (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 07/14/2020; Service Cost: 35.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CBL SERVICES, LLC., a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: OROKING INTERNATIONAL, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); FARSHID FARIDNIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CBL SERVICES, LLC., a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: OROKING INTERNATIONAL, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); FARSHID FARIDNIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CBL SERVICES, LLC., a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: OROKING INTERNATIONAL, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); FARSHID FARIDNIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CBL SERVICES, LLC., a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: OROKING INTERNATIONAL, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); FARSHID FARIDNIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 06/25/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Graciela Freixes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CBL SERVICES LLC. A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DIX LLOYD DOUGLAS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BEMIS, GARY A