This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 12:18:47 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC VS ROMERO, CIRILO

Case Summary

On 03/17/2017 CAVALRY SPV I LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ROMERO, CIRILO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VALERIE SALKIN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5282

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

VALERIE SALKIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendants

ROMERO CIRILO AN INDIVIDUAL

ROMERO CIRILO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

QUALL CARDOT LLP - ALEXA A. CHRISOS

Attorney at QUALL CARDOT LLP

CHRISOS ALEXA A.

 

Court Documents

Declaration (name extension) - CCP 1033

2/14/2018: Declaration (name extension) - CCP 1033

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/14/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal

2/14/2018: Request for Dismissal

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

2/14/2018: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - RE WAIVER OF INTEREST

2/14/2018: Declaration (name extension) - RE WAIVER OF INTEREST

Declaration (name extension) - RE WAIVER OF ATTORNEY FEES

2/14/2018: Declaration (name extension) - RE WAIVER OF ATTORNEY FEES

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

2/14/2018: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Judgment

4/17/2018: Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

4/23/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing Other scheduled for 03/02/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Does: 1-100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • DocketDefault judgment entered for Plaintiff (CAVALRY SPV I LLC) against Defendant (ROMERO, CIRILO) AN INDIVIDUAL on the Complaint filed by CAVALRY SPV I LLC on 03/17/2017 for damages of $2,694.41, attorney fees of $0.00, interest of $0.00, and costs of $294.00 for a total of $2,988.41.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: (CAVALRY SPV I LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1-100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by CAVALRY SPV I LLC on 03/17/2017, Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to , Does 1-100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: (CAVALRY SPV I LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: CIRILO ROMERO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketDefault entered as to CIRILO ROMERO; On the Complaint filed by CAVALRY SPV I LLC on 03/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketDECLARATION CCP 1788.60; Filed by: (CAVALRY SPV I LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketDeclaration CCP 1033; Filed by: (CAVALRY SPV I LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketDeclaration RE WAIVER OF ATTORNEY FEES; Filed by: (CAVALRY SPV I LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketDeclaration RE WAIVER OF INTEREST; Filed by: (CAVALRY SPV I LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketDECLARATION RE WAIVER OF SECURITY INTEREST; Filed by: (CAVALRY SPV I LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO CIRILO ROMERO SUB SERVED ON 041317 MAILEDO N 041417 DEC DIL ATTACHED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketOSC HEARING IS SET FOR 03/02/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT F43 . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY VALERIE SALKIN, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO RECORDS RE: FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN CHA538853050. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION RE: VENUE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.