This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/23/2019 at 01:18:09 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC VS MATHENGE, CATHERINE W

Case Summary

On 12/16/2015 CAVALRY SPV I LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MATHENGE, CATHERINE W. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL P RAMIREZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8439

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

DANIEL P RAMIREZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendants

MATHENGE CATHERINE W AN INDIVIDUAL

MATHENGE CATHERINE W

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

QUALL CARDOT LLP - RANJEET K BRAR

Attorney at QUALL CARDOT LLP

BRAR RANJEET K

 

Court Documents

Default Judgment

7/28/2017: Default Judgment

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (SACRAMENTO )

6/17/2019: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (SACRAMENTO )

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

6/13/2019: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2019
  • Writ of Execution (SACRAMENTO ); Issued by: (CAVALRY SPV I LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: CATHERINE W MATHENGE (Defendant); County: SACRAMENTO; Principal: 16787.22; Interest: 2989.50; Costs: 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: (CAVALRY SPV I LLC) (Plaintiff); Costs: 25.00; Interest: 2989.50; Credits: 0.00; Service Date: 06/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • OSC - Hearing (name extension) scheduled for 11/30/2018 at 08:30 AM in at Department B Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • Default judgment entered for Plaintiff (CAVALRY SPV I LLC) against Defendant (MATHENGE, CATHERINE W) AN INDIVIDUAL on the Complaint filed by (CAVALRY SPV I LLC) on 12/16/2015 for the principal amount of $16,348.22 and costs of $439.00 for a total of $16,787.22.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • Updated -- Default Judgment: Document Number changed from JUD015 - Judgment to JUD020 - Default Judgment; Status changed from Filed to Signed and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO RESEARCH ATTORNEY RE: REVIEW OF CC 1788 DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: SEC. 1033 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2017
  • WAIVER OF SECURITY INTEREST FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (MATHENGE, CATHERINE W) AN INDIVIDUAL .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (MATHENGE, CATHERINE W) AN INDIVIDUAL . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY COURT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO DOES / ROES 1-100 , [INCLUSIVE] ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (MATHENGE, CATHERINE W) AN INDIVIDUAL SUBSERVED BY LEAVING WITH JANE DOE ON 12/31/15 . COSTS OF $ 69.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • OSC HEARING IS SET FOR 11/30/18 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEY . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY DANIEL P RAMIREZ, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR455965081. Filing Fee: 370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less