This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/15/2020 at 05:51:00 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC VS MARIA D IKARI, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 09/29/2020 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARIA D IKARI, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANN H. PARK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3517

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANN H. PARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendant

IKARI MARIA D AN INDIVIDUAL

Baldwin Park, CA 91706-3349

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CASE CLAUDIA YVETTE

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/13/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/29/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Venue

9/29/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Venue

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

9/29/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Complaint - Complaint

9/29/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/29/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2021
  • Hearing10/05/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: MARIA D IKARI, an Individual (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/08/2020; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: MARIA D IKARI, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: MARIA D IKARI, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration of Venue; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: MARIA D IKARI, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: MARIA D IKARI, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 10/05/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ann H. Park in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less