Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2019 at 08:05:18 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC VS JULIA SANCHEZ

Case Summary

On 10/18/2017 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JULIA SANCHEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICK BROWN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5098

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICK BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendant

SANCHEZ JULIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCGAFFEY DAVID C.

 

Court Documents

Judgment

6/5/2018: Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - pursuant to code of civil procedure 1033

5/7/2018: Declaration (name extension) - pursuant to code of civil procedure 1033

Declaration (name extension) - re: accepting copies in lieu of originals

5/7/2018: Declaration (name extension) - re: accepting copies in lieu of originals

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

5/7/2018: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Dismissal

5/7/2018: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/7/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

6/18/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Proof of Personal Service

11/16/2017: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration (name extension) - VENUE

10/18/2017: Declaration (name extension) - VENUE

Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

10/18/2017: Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

Summons - on Complaint

10/18/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/18/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/18/2017: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/18/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

10/18/2017: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 10/18/2018 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Issued and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Does: 1 THROUGH 10 ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Default judgment entered for Plaintiff CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N.A. against Defendant JULIA SANCHEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL on the Complaint filed by CAVALRY SPV I, LLC on 10/18/2017 for the principal amount of $3,350.52, attorney fees of $0.00, interest of $0.00, and costs of $246.00 for a total of $3,596.52.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Declaration in support of application for entry of default judgment; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Declaration pursuant to code of civil procedure 1033; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Declaration re: accepting copies in lieu of originals; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1 THROUGH 10 ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • On the Complaint filed by CAVALRY SPV I, LLC on 10/18/2017, Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to , Does 1 THROUGH 10 ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: JULIA SANCHEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/24/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Rick Brown in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 10/18/2018 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: JULIA SANCHEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Declaration Pursuant to 1033 CCP; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • The case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Declaration VENUE; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McGaffey, David C