This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 11:40:24 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC VS ISIEV, RUSTAM

Case Summary

On 03/23/2017 CAVALRY SPV I LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ISIEV, RUSTAM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VALERIE SALKIN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5139

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

VALERIE SALKIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF C

CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK NA

Defendant

ISIEV RUSTAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WINN LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONAL CORP. - CASEY M JENSEN

Attorney at WINN LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONAL CORP.

JENSEN CASEY M

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

8/15/2017: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

3/16/2018: Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

Declaration (name extension) - SUPPORT OF APPLICATION

3/16/2018: Declaration (name extension) - SUPPORT OF APPLICATION

Declaration (name extension) - LOST ORIGINAL

3/16/2018: Declaration (name extension) - LOST ORIGINAL

Declaration (name extension) - MEMORANDUM OF CASE

3/16/2018: Declaration (name extension) - MEMORANDUM OF CASE

Request for Dismissal

3/16/2018: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/16/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

3/16/2018: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Judgment

5/9/2018: Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

5/15/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing Other scheduled for 03/09/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Does: 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketDefault judgment entered for Plaintiff (CAVALRY SPV I LLC) AS ASSIGNEE OF (CITIBANK NA) against Defendant (ISIEV, RUSTAM) on the Complaint filed by (CAVALRY SPV I LLC) AS ASSIGNEE OF (CITIBANK NA) on 03/23/2017 for the principal amount of $9,664.47 and costs of $285.00 for a total of $9,949.47.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketJUDICIAL NOTICE; Filed by: (CAVALRY SPV I LLC) AS ASSIGNEE OF (CITIBANK NA) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketDeclaration SUPPORT OF APPLICATION; Filed by: (CAVALRY SPV I LLC) AS ASSIGNEE OF (CITIBANK NA) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketDeclaration MEMORANDUM OF CASE; Filed by: (CAVALRY SPV I LLC) AS ASSIGNEE OF (CITIBANK NA) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketDeclaration LOST ORIGINAL; Filed by: (CAVALRY SPV I LLC) AS ASSIGNEE OF (CITIBANK NA) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketDeclaration of Costs - CCP 1033; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: (CAVALRY SPV I LLC) AS ASSIGNEE OF (CITIBANK NA) (Plaintiff); As to: RUSTAM ISIEV (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketDefault entered as to RUSTAM ISIEV; On the Complaint filed by (CAVALRY SPV I LLC) AS ASSIGNEE OF (CITIBANK NA) on 03/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: (CAVALRY SPV I LLC) AS ASSIGNEE OF (CITIBANK NA) (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by (CAVALRY SPV I LLC) AS ASSIGNEE OF (CITIBANK NA) on 03/23/2017, Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to , Does 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: (CAVALRY SPV I LLC) AS ASSIGNEE OF (CITIBANK NA) (Plaintiff); As to: RUSTAM ISIEV (Defendant); Service Date: 03/29/2017; Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketOSC HEARING IS SET FOR 03/09/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT F43 . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY VALERIE SALKIN, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO RECORDS RE: FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN CHA538853046. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less