Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/26/2021 at 04:40:32 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC VS GREGOR MISHEGYAN, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 03/18/2020 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GREGOR MISHEGYAN, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GRACIELA FREIXES. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1360

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GRACIELA FREIXES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendant

MISHEGYAN AN INDIVIDUAL GREGOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PACK TIFFANY A.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

12/8/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

3/24/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Venue

3/18/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Venue

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/18/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3/18/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Complaint - Complaint

3/18/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/18/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by CAVALRY SPV I, LLC on 03/18/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by CAVALRY SPV I, LLC as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: GREGOR MISHEGYAN, an Individual (Defendant); Service Date: 03/21/2020; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: GREGOR MISHEGYAN, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketDeclaration of Venue; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: GREGOR MISHEGYAN, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: GREGOR MISHEGYAN, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: GREGOR MISHEGYAN, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Graciela Freixes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PACK TIFFANY A.