This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/09/2019 at 00:28:29 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC VS FLORES, JOE

Case Summary

On 12/16/2015 CAVALRY SPV I LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FLORES, JOE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL P RAMIREZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8407

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

DANIEL P RAMIREZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendants

FLORES JOE AN INDIVIDUAL

FLORES JOE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

QUALL CARDOT LLP - WILLIAM G BUTTRY

Attorney at QUALL CARDOT LLP

BUTTRY WILLIAM G

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • DocketCOURT ORDERS DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 03/13/17 . FOR (CAVALRY SPV I LLC) . AGAINST (FLORES, JOE) AN INDIVIDUAL . PRINCIPAL $ 6568.62 . ATTORNEY FEES $ 0.00 . INTEREST $ 0.00 . COSTS $ 294.00 . TOTAL $ 6,862.62 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO RESEARCH ATTORNEY RE: 1788 COURT JUDGMENT REVIEW.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (FLORES, JOE) AN INDIVIDUAL . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY COURT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO DOES / ROES DOES 1 TO 100 , [INCLUSIVE] ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S WAIVER OF SECURITY INTEREST FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S WAIVER OF INTEREST IN EXCESS OF 10% FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S WAIVER OF ATTORNEYS' FEES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION RE: SEC. 1033 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION RE: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1788.60(A) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (FLORES, JOE) AN INDIVIDUAL SUBSERVED BY LEAVING WITH CINDY DOE OH 01/03/16 . COSTS OF $ 69.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • DocketOSC HEARING IS SET FOR 11/30/18 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEY . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY DANIEL P RAMIREZ, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR455965048. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less