Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/26/2020 at 00:26:11 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC VS ARIEK MOCHTAR, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 09/19/2019 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ARIEK MOCHTAR, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDY RHODES. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7289

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RANDY RHODES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendant

MOCHTAR AN INDIVIDUAL ARIEK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PACK TIFFANY ANNE

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

6/18/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Regarding Non Service - Non Estes

10/21/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Regarding Non Service - Non Estes

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/19/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

9/19/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Regarding Statement of Venue

9/19/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Regarding Statement of Venue

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/19/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

9/19/2019: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Cavalry SPV I, LLC on 09/19/2019, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Cavalry SPV I, LLC as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketDeclaration Regarding Non Service - Non Estes; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Ariek Mochtar, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Cavalry SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Ariek Mochtar, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Ariek Mochtar, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketDeclaration Regarding Statement of Venue; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Ariek Mochtar, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Randy Rhodes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less