Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/12/2021 at 04:08:12 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK FKA GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK, VS CHARISSE GRIFFINCOOK,

Case Summary

On 03/06/2020 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK FKA GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHARISSE GRIFFINCOOK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0187

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK FKA GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK

Defendant

GRIFFINCOOK CHARISSE

Los Angeles, CA 90047-4123

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARA GRACE

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 10/06/2020

10/6/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 10/06/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

10/6/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: 1788

10/7/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: 1788

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/7/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: 1033

10/7/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: 1033

Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice

10/7/2020: Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice

Memorandum (name extension) - Memorandum Memorandum of Case in Support of Request for Judgment

10/7/2020: Memorandum (name extension) - Memorandum Memorandum of Case in Support of Request for Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

10/7/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

10/13/2020: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution

11/17/2020: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

11/17/2020: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

2/11/2021: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/10/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/6/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

3/6/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/6/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/6/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3/6/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, as assignee of SYNCHRONY BANK (Plaintiff); As to: CHARISSE GRIFFINCOOK, (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution; Issued by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, as assignee of SYNCHRONY BANK (Plaintiff); As to: CHARISSE GRIFFINCOOK, (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, as assignee of SYNCHRONY BANK (Plaintiff); As to: CHARISSE GRIFFINCOOK, (Defendant); Costs: 0.00; Interest: 11.93; Credits: 0.00; Service Date: 11/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, as assignee of SYNCHRONY BANK (Plaintiff); As to: CHARISSE GRIFFINCOOK, (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment: Status changed from Filed to Signed and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, as assignee of SYNCHRONY BANK FKA GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK against Defendant CHARISSE GRIFFINCOOK, on the Complaint filed by CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, as assignee of SYNCHRONY BANK on 03/06/2020 for the principal amount of $1,501.68 and costs of $309.50 for a total of $1,811.18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 129 with DismissalParty:2110514 resulted in empty message

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, as assignee of SYNCHRONY BANK (Plaintiff); As to: CHARISSE GRIFFINCOOK, (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Re: 1788; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, as assignee of SYNCHRONY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 03/14/2022 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, as assignee of SYNCHRONY BANK (Plaintiff); As to: CHARISSE GRIFFINCOOK, (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 07/09/2020; Service Cost: 84.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lillian Vega Jacobs in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, as assignee of SYNCHRONY BANK (Plaintiff); As to: CHARISSE GRIFFINCOOK, (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, as assignee of SYNCHRONY BANK (Plaintiff); As to: CHARISSE GRIFFINCOOK, (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, as assignee of SYNCHRONY BANK (Plaintiff); As to: CHARISSE GRIFFINCOOK, (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARA GRACE