Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/21/2021 at 07:48:54 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N.A. VS SEOKJIN SUH

Case Summary

On 12/28/2020 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SEOKJIN SUH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GRACIELA FREIXES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2985

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GRACIELA FREIXES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A.

Defendant

SUH SEOKJIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GORDON JOHN

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

1/15/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Complaint - Complaint

12/28/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/28/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/28/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/28/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

12/28/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2022
  • Hearing01/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I, LLC as assignee of Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Seokjin Suh (Defendant); Service Date: 01/14/2021; Service Cost: 77.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Graciela Freixes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I, LLC as assignee of Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Seokjin Suh (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Cavalry SPV I, LLC as assignee of Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Seokjin Suh (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I, LLC as assignee of Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Seokjin Suh (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GORDON JOHN