This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2019 at 19:13:50 (UTC).

CATHERINE MARTIN VS SARAH AGBELUSI

Case Summary

On 03/05/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by CATHERINE MARTIN against SARAH AGBELUSI in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3665

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTIN CATHERINE

Defendant

AGBELUSI SARAH

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES

8/15/2019: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES

Notice of Related Case - Notice of Related Case

8/15/2019: Notice of Related Case - Notice of Related Case

Notice of Change of Firm Name - Notice of Change of Firm Name

1/16/2019: Notice of Change of Firm Name - Notice of Change of Firm Name

Notice (name extension) - Notice NOTICE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY CHANGE

1/18/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice NOTICE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY CHANGE

Notice of Deposit - Jury - Notice of Deposit - Jury

1/31/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury - Notice of Deposit - Jury

Notice of Deposit - Jury - Notice of Deposit - Jury

2/15/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury - Notice of Deposit - Jury

Proof of Personal Service

3/16/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - on Complaint

3/5/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/5/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/5/2018: Complaint

Demand for Jury Trial

4/12/2018: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

4/12/2018: Answer

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/5/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2021
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order TO CONTINUE TRIAL, AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES: Status Date changed from 08/15/2019 to 08/15/2019; Name Extension changed from [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES to TO CONTINUE TRIAL, AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES; As To Parties changed from Catherine Martin (Plaintiff) to Catherine Martin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by: Sarah Agbelusi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES; Filed by: Sarah Agbelusi (Defendant); As to: Catherine Martin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/03/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 12/12/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by: Catherine Martin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 94 - Hon. James E. Blancarte; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by: Sarah Agbelusi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketNotice NOTICE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY CHANGE; Filed by: Sarah Agbelusi (Defendant); As to: Catherine Martin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Sarah Agbelusi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Sarah Agbelusi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Catherine Martin (Plaintiff); As to: Sarah Agbelusi (Defendant); Service Date: 03/11/18; Service Cost: 140.25; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Catherine Martin (Plaintiff); As to: Sarah Agbelusi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Catherine Martin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/03/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STLC03665    Hearing Date: December 09, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

REZA KHORRAM,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

SARAH AGBELUSI, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: 18STCV00566 R/T 18STLC03665

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO RECLASSIFY

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

December 10, 2019

1. Background Facts

On 8/30/19, the Court deemed 18STCV00566 and 18STLC03665 related, as they arise out of the same automobile accident.

2. Motion to Relate Actions

At this time, the plaintiff in the limited action moves to reclassify the limited action as an unlimited action so the cases can be consolidated. Per Local Rule 3.3(g)(3), 18STLC03665 is reclassified and Moving Party is ordered to pay the reclassification fee.

3. Stipulation to Consolidate Cases

Moving Plaintiff indicates the parties intend to submit a stipulation to consolidate the two cases for all purposes. Plaintiff asks the Court, in connection with this motion, to continue the trial date and related cut-off dates to reflect the unlimited trial court’s trial and discovery cut-off dates. The Court will process all necessary trial and other date changes at the time it reviews and signs the stipulation to consolidate the two cases. The Court asks the parties to submit the stipulation forthwith.

Moving Plaintiff is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.