This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/06/2019 at 01:16:50 (UTC).

CATALINA GARCIA VS NATURE'S SUNSHINE PRODUCTS, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/09/2018 CATALINA GARCIA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NATURE'S SUNSHINE PRODUCTS, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RAY A. SANTANA. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2893

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RAY A. SANTANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARCIA CATALINA

Bellflower, CA 90706

Defendants

ANAV AHRON

NATURE'S SUNSHINE PRODUCTS INC.

VALENCIA GENOVEA

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

1/23/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/23/2019

1/23/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/23/2019

Other - (name extension) - Other - Complaint for Damages (Filed 2/6/17 - BC649399)

11/9/2018: Other - (name extension) - Other - Complaint for Damages (Filed 2/6/17 - BC649399)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

11/9/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]

11/13/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2019
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Catalina Garcia on 11/09/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/23/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/23/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 updated: Result Date to 01/23/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • Other - Complaint for Damages (Filed 2/6/17 - BC649399); Filed by: Catalina Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/23/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Ray A. Santana in Department 90 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Catalina Garcia (Plaintiff); As to: Nature's Sunshine Products, Inc. (Defendant); Genovea Valencia (Defendant); Ahron Anav (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nature's Sunshine Products is a litigant