This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/07/2021 at 06:08:57 (UTC).

CASSANDRA SALAZAR VS NBT BANK, N.A.

Case Summary

On 10/11/2019 CASSANDRA SALAZAR filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NBT BANK, N A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9446

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SALAZAR CASSANDRA

Defendant

BANK N.A. NBT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YEARGIN COLE WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

7/6/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Removal of Action to Federal Court

8/5/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Removal of Action to Federal Court

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/6/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

10/11/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/11/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

10/11/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/11/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Cassandra Salazar on 10/11/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/09/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCase is Deemed Complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Removal of Action to Federal Court; Filed by: NBT Bank, N.A. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Cassandra Salazar (Plaintiff); As to: NBT Bank, N.A. (Defendant); Service Date: 07/06/2020; Service Cost: 125.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Cassandra Salazar (Plaintiff); As to: NBT Bank, N.A. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/09/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Cassandra Salazar (Plaintiff); As to: NBT Bank, N.A. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Cassandra Salazar (Plaintiff); As to: NBT Bank, N.A. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer YEARGIN COLE