This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2021 at 17:35:01 (UTC).

CASSANDRA A. YOUNG VS CRYSTAL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

Case Summary

On 10/19/2020 CASSANDRA A YOUNG filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CRYSTAL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1951

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YOUNG CASSANDRA A.

Defendant

CRYSTAL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC.

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Amended)

3/29/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Amended)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

3/18/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/18/2021

3/18/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/18/2021

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

3/18/2021: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

3/18/2021: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice Of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer]

2/24/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice Of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer]

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court), Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]

12/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court), Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]

Attachment - Attachment

12/30/2020: Attachment - Attachment

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Attachment, Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court, Request to Waive Court Fees]

10/19/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Attachment, Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court, Request to Waive Court Fees]

Attachment - Attachment

10/19/2020: Attachment - Attachment

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

10/19/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2021
  • Hearing07/09/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department S at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketAmended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Cassandra A. Young (Plaintiff); As to: Crystal Property Management, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Crystal Property Management, INC. (Defendant) to Crystal Property Management, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Crystal Property Management, INC. (Defendant) to Crystal Property Management, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Crystal Property Management, INC. (Defendant) to Crystal Property Management, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Waive Court Fees: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court): Result: Granted; As To Parties changed from Cassandra A. Young (Plaintiff) to Cassandra A. Young (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketAmended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Cassandra A. Young (Plaintiff); As to: Crystal Property Management (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Cassandra A. Young (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims): Filed By: Cassandra A. Young (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 03/18/2021; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Crystal Property Management (Defendant) to Crystal Property Management (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/18/2021 at 01:30 PM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Crystal Property Management (Defendant) to Crystal Property Management (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Waive Court Fees: Result Date changed from 12/16/2020 to 12/16/2020; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketAttachment; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Attachment, Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court, Request to Waive Court Fees]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Cassandra A. Young (Plaintiff); As to: Crystal Property Management (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Cassandra A. Young (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Cassandra A. Young (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld in Department S Santa Monica Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CRYSTAL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC. is a litigant