This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/26/2020 at 03:23:59 (UTC).

CASHCALL INC VS SOCORRO RODRIGUEZ-BARRERA

Case Summary

On 09/27/2018 CASHCALL INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SOCORRO RODRIGUEZ-BARRERA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA MAY J. SANTOS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4907

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA MAY J. SANTOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASHCALL INC

Defendant

RODRIGUEZ-BARRERA SOCORRO

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

6/3/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

3/6/2019: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]

3/11/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

9/9/2019: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/24/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/27/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]

1/11/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

6/3/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

3/11/2019: Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/12/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

9/27/2018: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

6/3/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

12/12/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/03/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

6/3/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/03/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Sacramento)

9/9/2019: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Sacramento)

Notice (name extension) - Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT

1/11/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: Cashcall Inc (Plaintiff); As to: SOCORRO RODRIGUEZ-BARRERA (Defendant); Costs: 0.00; Interest: 55.58; Credits: 0.00; Service Date: 08/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Sacramento); Filed by: County: Sacramento; Principal: 2,386.50; Interest: 55.58; Costs: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims): As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Cashcall Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Cashcall Inc against Defendant SOCORRO RODRIGUEZ-BARRERA on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Cashcall Inc on 09/27/2018 for the principal amount of $2,250.00 and costs of $136.50 for a total of $2,386.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/03/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/03/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 06/03/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Cashcall Inc (Plaintiff); As to: SOCORRO RODRIGUEZ-BARRERA (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/23/2019; Service Cost: 86.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/18/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Cashcall Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/12/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 03/18/2019 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/12/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 12/12/2018; Result Type to Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion; Result Type from Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion to Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/12/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Cashcall Inc (Plaintiff); As to: SOCORRO RODRIGUEZ-BARRERA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maria May J. Santos in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.