This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/12/2019 at 01:15:45 (UTC).

CASHCALL INC VS DENNIS JAVIER

Case Summary

On 08/31/2018 CASHCALL INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DENNIS JAVIER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA MAY J. SANTOS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4683

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA MAY J. SANTOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASHCALL INC

Defendant

JAVIER DENNIS

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/3/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

8/31/2018: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

12/3/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

3/12/2019: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

6/14/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]

12/31/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

8/31/2018: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/14/2019

6/14/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/14/2019

Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

3/15/2019: Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

8/31/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT

12/31/2018: Notice (name extension) - Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims), Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]

3/18/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims), Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2019
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Cashcall Inc on 08/31/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/14/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/14/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 06/14/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims), Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Pursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/28/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 06/14/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Cashcall Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Cashcall Inc (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Cashcall Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2018
  • Updated -- 03/28/2019 Non-Jury Trial: Location changed from Department SE2 to Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Cashcall Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/28/2019 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Case reassigned to Bellflower Courthouse in Department 1 - Hon. Carol Rose; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/03/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Cashcall Inc (Plaintiff); As to: DENNIS JAVIER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Maria May J. Santos in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.