This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/15/2020 at 08:30:06 (UTC).

CASA DE CABRILLO, L.P. VS DAVID D. TITWORTH, II

Case Summary

On 02/24/2020 CASA DE CABRILLO, L P filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DAVID D TITWORTH, II. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DOUGLAS W. STERN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0402

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

DOUGLAS W. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASA DE CABRILLO L.P.

Defendant

TITWORTH II DAVID D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPARKS VALERIE A.

 

Court Documents

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution

3/20/2020: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution

Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

3/18/2020: Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

3/17/2020: Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

3/16/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/16/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/16/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

2/25/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (David D. Titworth, II)

2/25/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (David D. Titworth, II)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/24/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/24/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

2/24/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

2/24/2020: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/24/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Writ - Return - Writ - Return

8/27/2020: Writ - Return - Writ - Return

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution: Filed By: CASA DE CABRILLO, L.P. (Plaintiff); Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 08/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Unsatisfied);; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: Yes; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution; Issued by: CASA DE CABRILLO, L.P. (Plaintiff); As to: David D. Titworth, II (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by: CASA DE CABRILLO, L.P. (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 0.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: CASA DE CABRILLO, L.P. (Plaintiff); As to: David D. Titworth, II (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff CASA DE CABRILLO, L.P. against Defendant David D. Titworth, II on the Complaint filed by CASA DE CABRILLO, L.P. on 02/24/2020 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 2111 W. Williams Street, #244A, Long Beach, CA 90810 is granted for plaintiff(s);; The Rental Agreement under which the property is held is hereby cancelled.; Lease Agreement under which the property is held is hereby forfeited.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/04/2020 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to David D. Titworth, II; unnamed occupants pursuant to CCP 415.46; On the Complaint filed by CASA DE CABRILLO, L.P. on 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: CASA DE CABRILLO, L.P. (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; Proof of Mailing Date: 02/28/2020; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: CASA DE CABRILLO, L.P. (Plaintiff); As to: David D. Titworth, II (Defendant); Service Date: 02/28/2020; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: CASA DE CABRILLO, L.P. (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; David D. Titworth, II (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 02/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CASA DE CABRILLO, L.P. (Plaintiff); As to: David D. Titworth, II (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CASA DE CABRILLO, L.P. (Plaintiff); As to: David D. Titworth, II (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CASA DE CABRILLO, L.P. (Plaintiff); As to: David D. Titworth, II (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/04/2020 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Douglas W. Stern in Department S13 Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CASA DE CABRILLO L. P. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sparks, Valerie