This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2017 at 08:57:48 (UTC).

CARTER BRAVMANN VS AGHANABI BAHRAM

Case Summary

On 07/12/2016 CARTER BRAVMANN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AGHANABI BAHRAM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1255

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRAVMANN CARTER

Los Angeles, CA 90069

Defendant

BAHRAM AGHANABI

Van Nuys, CA 91406

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

7/12/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Acceptance

7/12/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Acceptance

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

7/12/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

7/12/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Notice of Rejection

9/8/2016: Notice of Rejection

Minute Order of 09/07/2016

9/7/2016: Minute Order of 09/07/2016

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

9/7/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/24/2016: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Rejection Sheet - Fax filing of Request to Postpone Trial

8/31/2016: Rejection Sheet - Fax filing of Request to Postpone Trial

[Rejection Sheet Fax filing of Request to Postpone Trial]

8/31/2016: [Rejection Sheet Fax filing of Request to Postpone Trial]

Notice of Rejection

8/31/2016: Notice of Rejection

Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

11/8/2016: Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

Other - (name extension) - Small Claims Settlement Agreement

11/8/2016: Other - (name extension) - Small Claims Settlement Agreement

Minute Order of 11/08/2016

11/8/2016: Minute Order of 11/08/2016

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

11/8/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/24/2016: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2016
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 11/08/2016; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/08/2016 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 11/08/2016; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • Other - Small Claims Settlement Agreement; Filed by: Carter Bravmann (Plaintiff); Aghanabi Bahram (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Carter Bravmann (Plaintiff); As to: Aghanabi Bahram (Defendant); Proof Of Mailing: No; Service Cost: 79.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Carter Bravmann (Plaintiff); As to: Aghanabi Bahram (Defendant); Proof Of Mailing: No; Service Cost: 79.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • Notice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Rejection Sheet Fax filing of Request to Postpone Trial]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • Rejection Sheet Fax filing of Request to Postpone Trial; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: 1160713E8578 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1160713E8578 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/07/2016 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Carter Bravmann (Plaintiff); As to: Aghanabi Bahram (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Acceptance; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.