This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 15:04:21 (UTC).

CARROLL CANAL LLC VS RM AUCTIONS INC

Case Summary

On 11/02/2017 CARROLL CANAL LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RM AUCTIONS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4064

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARROLL CANAL LLC

Defendant

RM AUCTIONS INC AKA RKM AUTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MELLER ERIC

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/2/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint

11/2/2017: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/2/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - on Complaint

11/2/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Notice (name extension) - of Filing Proof of Service

11/16/2017: Notice (name extension) - of Filing Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal

1/23/2018: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/02/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/05/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Carroll Canal LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketRequest for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketNotice of Filing Proof of Service; Filed by: Carroll Canal LLC (Plaintiff); As to: RM Auctions Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: Name Extension changed from on Complaint to on Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/02/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/05/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Carroll Canal LLC (Plaintiff); As to: RM Auctions Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Carroll Canal LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine Lu in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RM Auctions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meller, Eric