This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/26/2018 at 09:55:54 (UTC).

CARRIE DODD VS NANZI VELEZ

Case Summary

On 08/07/2017 CARRIE DODD filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NANZI VELEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOEL L. LOFTON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1267

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOEL L. LOFTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DODD CARRIE

Canoga Park, CA 91303

Defendant

VELEZ NANZI

Little Rock, CA 93543

 

Court Documents

Order on Request for Court Order

12/4/2017: Order on Request for Court Order

Certificate of Mailing for - [Request for Court Order and Answer, Order on Request for Court Order]

12/21/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - [Request for Court Order and Answer, Order on Request for Court Order]

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

11/21/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

11/29/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

11/29/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

11/29/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Request for Court Order and Answer

10/27/2017: Request for Court Order and Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - [Request for Court Order and Answer]

11/3/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - [Request for Court Order and Answer]

Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

10/19/2017: Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) [Event = HRG000]

10/12/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) [Event = HRG000]

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/25/2017

10/25/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/25/2017

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

10/25/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

10/24/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

Notice - E-Filing Payment Due

8/7/2017: Notice - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

8/7/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

8/7/2017: Notice - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer, Order on Request for Court Order]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Updated -- Order on Request for Court Order: Result: Granted; Result Date: 12/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Updated -- Order on Request for Court Order: Status Date changed from 11/27/2017 to 12/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • , Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/29/2017 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22 RES was rescheduled to 01/01/1970 10:00 AM at Department A14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/29/2017 at 10:00 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/29/2017 at 10:00 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A14 updated: Result Date to 11/29/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Carrie Dodd against Defendant Nanzi Velez on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Carrie Dodd on 08/07/2017 for the principal amount of $4,100.00 and costs of $100.00 for a total of $4,200.00.; This judgment results from a motor vehicle accident on a California highway and was caused by the judgment debtor's operation of a motor vehicle. If the judgment is not paid, the judgment creditor may apply to have the judgment debtor's drivers license suspended.

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 10/24/2017
  • Dismissal entered on 10/25/2017, as to entire action is Vacated - Per court order. Request to postpone was submitted and signed..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: As to: Nanzi Velez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Carrie Dodd (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/29/2017 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Joel L. Lofton in Department A22 Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/25/2017 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Carrie Dodd (Plaintiff); As to: Nanzi Velez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.