This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/23/2020 at 00:27:53 (UTC).

CARPA TRANSPORT INC. VS R. MITCHEL, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/21/2019 CARPA TRANSPORT INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against R MITCHEL, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9755

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARPA TRANSPORT INC.

Defendants

R. MITCHEL INC.

BROWN PAULA ALEENE

BROWN DENNIS GEORGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOODMAN HOWARD

Defendant Attorney

ELLISON CHRISTOPHER

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

9/21/2020: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Order of Matters deemed admitted and f...)

9/21/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Order of Matters deemed admitted and f...)

Motion for Order (name extension) - Motion for Order that Matters in Request for Admission be Deemed Admitted and for Sanctions

4/9/2020: Motion for Order (name extension) - Motion for Order that Matters in Request for Admission be Deemed Admitted and for Sanctions

Answer - Answer

1/13/2020: Answer - Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/13/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/13/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/13/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Complaint - Complaint

10/21/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/21/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/21/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

10/21/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/21/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2022
  • Hearing10/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • Hearing04/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion for Order that Matters in Request for Admission be Deemed Admitted and for Sanctions: Filed By: Carpa Transport Inc. (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 09/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion for Order of Matters deemed admitted and f...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Order of Matters deemed admitted and for sanctions scheduled for 09/21/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 09/21/2020; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketMotion for Order that Matters in Request for Admission be Deemed Admitted and for Sanctions; Filed by: Carpa Transport Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Order of Matters deemed admitted and for sanctions scheduled for 09/21/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: R. Mitchel, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Carpa Transport Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Carpa Transport Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Dennis George Brown (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/20/2019; Service Cost: 47.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Carpa Transport Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Paula Aleene Brown (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/20/2019; Service Cost: 47.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Carpa Transport Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: R. Mitchel, Inc. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/20/2019; Service Cost: 47.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Carpa Transport Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: R. Mitchel, Inc. (Defendant); Dennis George Brown (Defendant); Paula Aleene Brown (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Carpa Transport Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: R. Mitchel, Inc. (Defendant); Dennis George Brown (Defendant); Paula Aleene Brown (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Carpa Transport Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: R. Mitchel, Inc. (Defendant); Dennis George Brown (Defendant); Paula Aleene Brown (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC09755    Hearing Date: September 21, 2020    Dept: 26

Carpa Transport, Inc. v. R. Mitchel, Inc, et al. 

MOTION TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION ADMITTED

(CCP § 2033.280)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Carpa Transport, Inc.’s Motion to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted Against Defendant R. Mitchel, Inc. is GRANTED. DEFENDANT IS TO PAY SANCTIONS OF $410.00 TO PLAINTIFF’S COUNSEL WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER.

ANALYSIS:

On January 28, 2020, Plaintiff Carpa Transport, Inc. (“Plaintiff”) served Requests for Admissions on Defendant R. Mitchel, Inc. (“Defendant”). (Motion, Goodman Decl., Exh. 1.) After the deadline to respond had passed, Plaintiff sought to meet and confer. (Id. at ¶¶3-4.) As of the filing of the instant Motion to Deem Requests for Admission on April 9, 2020, Plaintiff had not received any responses to the discovery requests propounded on Defendant. (Id. at ¶3-5.) To date, no opposition to the Motion has been filed.

Due to Defendant’s failure to serve verified responses to the discovery propounded by Plaintiff, the requests for admission are deemed admitted. The Court also finds the failure to respond a misuse of the discovery process. Sanctions are mandatory under Code of Civil Procedure sections 2023.010, 2023.030 and 2033.280, and have been properly noticed. Using a lodestar calculation, sanctions are granted against Defendant in the amount of $410.00, based on one hour of attorney time billed at $350.00 per hour, plus the $60.00 filing fee. (Id. at ¶6.)

Plaintiff Carpa Transport, Inc.’s Motion to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted Against Defendant R. Mitchel, Inc. is GRANTED. DEFENDANT IS TO PAY SANCTIONS OF $410.00 TO PLAINTIFF’S COUNSEL WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER.

Moving party to give notice.