This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/08/2021 at 00:25:45 (UTC).

CARMEN JUAREZ VS JENNIFER MARTIN

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 CARMEN JUAREZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JENNIFER MARTIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0083

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JUAREZ CARMEN

Defendant

MARTIN JENNIFER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GROSSMAN LESLIE K.

 

Court Documents

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

1/6/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Complaint - Complaint

1/6/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/6/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/6/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

7/6/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

7/6/2021: Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of 07/06/2021

7/6/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of 07/06/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of 07/06/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/06/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 07/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Carmen Juarez on 01/06/2020, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to CCP 581(b)(3)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Carmen Juarez (Plaintiff); As to: Jennifer Martin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Carmen Juarez (Plaintiff); As to: Jennifer Martin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/06/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GROSSMAN LESLIE KENNETH