This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/29/2021 at 06:19:19 (UTC).

CARLOS R. MORAN VS LOU SOBH CERRITOS SATURN INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/13/2020 CARLOS R MORAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LOU SOBH CERRITOS SATURN INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2707

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORAN CARLOS R.

Defendants

KIA MOTORS AMERICA INC.

LOU SOBH CERRITOS SATURN INC. DBA KIA OF CERRITOS

 

Court Documents

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

3/8/2021: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil) - Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil)

4/7/2021: Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil) - Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil)

Other - (name extension) - Other - Exhibit Receipt

12/30/2020: Other - (name extension) - Other - Exhibit Receipt

Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

12/29/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

12/29/2020: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

12/29/2020: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/29/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

12/29/2020: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 12/29/2020, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

12/29/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 12/29/2020, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Receipt for Exhibits - Receipt for Exhibits

12/29/2020: Receipt for Exhibits - Receipt for Exhibits

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

10/13/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]

10/13/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: CARLOS R. MORAN (Plaintiff); As to: LOU SOBH CERRITOS SATURN INC. (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 03/08/2021 ; Status Date changed from 12/29/2020 to 03/08/2021 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketOther - Exhibit Receipt; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/29/2020 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 12/29/2020; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 12/29/2020, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: LOU SOBH CERRITOS SATURN INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: CARLOS R. MORAN (Plaintiff); As to: LOU SOBH CERRITOS SATURN INC. (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 12/04/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff CARLOS R. MORAN against Defendant LOU SOBH CERRITOS SATURN INC. DBA KIA OF CERRITOS on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by CARLOS R. MORAN on 10/13/2020 for the principal amount of $550.00 and costs of $50.00 for a total of $600.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by CARLOS R. MORAN on 10/13/2020, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketReceipt for Exhibits; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: CARLOS R. MORAN (Plaintiff); As to: LOU SOBH CERRITOS SATURN INC. (Defendant); KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/29/2020 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOU SOBH CERRITOS SATURN INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION DBA KIA OF CERRITOS is a litigant

Latest cases where Kia Motors America, Inc. is a litigant