This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/12/2019 at 03:08:46 (UTC).

CARLOS DE LEON VS MARVIN DELEON ESTUARDO

Case Summary

On 12/28/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by CARLOS DE LEON against MARVIN DELEON ESTUARDO in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5314

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DE LEON CARLOS

Defendant

ESTUARDO MARVIN DELEON

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

2/21/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

First Amended Standing Order

12/28/2018: First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/28/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/28/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/28/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

12/28/2018: Complaint - Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: Carlos De Leon (Plaintiff); As to: Marvin Deleon Estuardo (Defendant); Service Date: 02/03/2019; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Case reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 94 - Hon. James E. Blancarte; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/26/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Case assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by: Carlos De Leon (Plaintiff); As to: Marvin Deleon Estuardo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Carlos De Leon (Plaintiff); As to: Marvin Deleon Estuardo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Carlos De Leon (Plaintiff); As to: Marvin Deleon Estuardo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • First Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STLC15314    Hearing Date: November 04, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

CARLOS DE LEON,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

MARVIN DELEON ESTUARDO, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: 18STLC15314

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT’S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO DEEM RFAS ADMITTED

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

November 4, 2019

Defendant propounded RFAs on Plaintiff on 4/05/19. To date, despite a meet and confer effort, Plaintiff has not served responses. Defendant therefore seeks an order deeming the RFAs admitted and imposing sanctions. Defendant’s motion to deem RFAs admitted is granted. CCP §2033.280(b).

Sanctions are mandatory. §2033.280(c). Defendant seeks sanctions in the amount of $2095/motion. Defense Counsel bills at the rate of $185/hour. The Court awards one hour to prepare this form discovery motion. No opposition was filed and therefore no reply was necessary. The Court awards three hours of time to appear, as Counsel is located in Long Beach. The Court therefore awards a total of four hours of attorney time at the requested rate of $185/hour, or $740 in attorneys’ fees. The Court also awards the requested $60 in costs.

Sanctions are sought and imposed against Plaintiff and her attorney of record, jointly and severally; they are ordered to pay sanctions to Defendant, by and through his attorney of record, in the total amount of $800, within twenty days. Defendant is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.