This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2019 at 23:24:29 (UTC).

CARLOS ALANIZ, ET AL. VS SANDY VANESSA GARCIA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/06/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by CARLOS ALANIZ against SANDY VANESSA GARCIA in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5478

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TORRES RAQUEL MUNOZ

ALANIZ CARLOS

Defendants

GARCIA SANDY VANESSA

PEREZ HORTENCIA

CARDENAZ RICARDO SANCHEZ

 

Court Documents

Summons - on Complaint

4/6/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/6/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/6/2018: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/6/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 77 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 77 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Carlos Alaniz (Plaintiff); Raquel Munoz Torres (Plaintiff); As to: Sandy Vanessa Garcia (Defendant); Ricardo Sanchez Cardenaz (Defendant); Hortencia Perez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Carlos Alaniz (Plaintiff); Raquel Munoz Torres (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Georgina T. Rizk in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/04/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/09/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STLC05478    Hearing Date: March 09, 2020    Dept: 25

MOTION TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL

(CCP § 473(b))

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiffs Carlos Alaniz and Raquel Munoz Torrez’s Motion to Set Aside Dismissal is GRANTED.

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background

On April 6, 2018, Plaintiffs Carlos Alaniz and Raquel Munoz Torrez (collectively, “Plaintiffs”) filed an action for motor vehicle negligence and general negligence against Defendants Sandy Vanessa Garcia, Ricardo Sanchez Cardenaz, and Hortencia Perez (collectively, “Defendants”).

A non-jury trial was scheduled for October 4, 2019. Due to the matter being placed on second call and there being no appearances by either side by 8:54 a.m., the Court dismissed the case without prejudice. (10/4/19 Minute Order.)

On February 6, 2020, Plaintiffs filed the instant Motion to Set Aside Dismissal (the “Motion”). To date, no opposition has been filed.

  1. Legal Standard & Discussion

Plaintiffs seek relief pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 473, subdivision (b). (Mot., p. 5.) Under this statute, an application for relief must be made no more than six months after entry of the order from which relief is sought and must be accompanied by an affidavit of fault attesting to the mistake, inadvertence, surprise or neglect of the moving party or its attorney. (Code Civ. Proc., § 473, subd. (b); English v. IKON Business Solutions (2001) 94 Cal.App.4th 130, 143.)

Plaintiffs’ Motion is timely. Plaintiffs seek to set aside the October 4, 2019 dismissal based on Plaintiffs’ counsel’s mistake, inadvertence, surprise or neglect. (Mot., p. 5.) Specifically, Plaintiffs’ counsel states that because of the status of settlement discussions between the parties and the fact that no defendant had responded to the Complaint, he believed the matter would not proceed to trial. (Mot., Chesney Decl., ¶ 5.) In addition, Plaintiffs’ counsel states he believed the trial date had been continued by stipulation. (Id.)

Based on the timely request to vacate the dismissal supported by an attorney affidavit of fault, Plaintiffs’ Motion is GRANTED.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs Carlos Alaniz and Raquel Munoz Torrez’s Motion to Set Aside Dismissal is GRANTED.

Moving parties are ordered to give notice.