This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/11/2019 at 01:39:03 (UTC).

CAPTIAL AUTO FINANCIAL INC. VS YOLANDA MARTINEZ

Case Summary

On 04/19/2018 CAPTIAL AUTO FINANCIAL INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against YOLANDA MARTINEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANDREW E. COOPER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0913

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANDREW E. COOPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPTIAL AUTO FINANCIAL INC.

Defendant

MARTINEZ YOLANDA

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

4/19/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/10/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/24/2018

5/24/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/24/2018

Minute Order - (Amended)

5/24/2018: Minute Order - (Amended)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

5/24/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/24/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/24/2018 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44 updated: Result Date to 05/24/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • Amended Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Captial Auto Financial Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Yolanda Martinez (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/28/2018; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Captial Auto Financial Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Yolanda Martinez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Andrew E. Cooper in Department F44 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/24/2018 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAPITAL AUTO FINANCIAL INC. (DOE 2) is a litigant