This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2020 at 03:15:52 (UTC).

CAPITAL TRUST ESCROW VS THERESA MOORE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/13/2019 CAPITAL TRUST ESCROW filed an Other lawsuit against THERESA MOORE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1638

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL TRUST ESCROW

Defendants

MOORE THERESA

MILLS CHARLIE MORRIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ADLER JAMES E.

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT OF INTERPLEADER ACTION FOR DISBURSEMENT OF INTERPLED FUNDS ON DEPOSIT WITH THE COURT AND DISMISSAL

8/13/2019: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT OF INTERPLEADER ACTION FOR DISBURSEMENT OF INTERPLED FUNDS ON DEPOSIT WITH THE COURT AND DISMISSAL

Order (name extension) - Order ORDER ON STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT OF INTERPLEADER ACTION AND FOR DISBURSEMENT OF INTERPLED FUNDS ON DEPOSIT WITH THE COURT AND DISMISSAL

8/13/2019: Order (name extension) - Order ORDER ON STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT OF INTERPLEADER ACTION AND FOR DISBURSEMENT OF INTERPLED FUNDS ON DEPOSIT WITH THE COURT AND DISMISSAL

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re Stipulation for Settlement of Interpleader Act...) of 08/13/2019

8/13/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re Stipulation for Settlement of Interpleader Act...) of 08/13/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order re Stipulation for Settlement of Interpleader Act...)

8/13/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order re Stipulation for Settlement of Interpleader Act...)

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF JAMES E. ADLER RE: EX PARTE NOTICE

10/2/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF JAMES E. ADLER RE: EX PARTE NOTICE

Order (name extension) - Order [Proposed] ORDER CORRECTING MISDEPOSIT OF FUNDS AND DIRECTING CREDIT TO THE CORRECT CASE

10/4/2019: Order (name extension) - Order [Proposed] ORDER CORRECTING MISDEPOSIT OF FUNDS AND DIRECTING CREDIT TO THE CORRECT CASE

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER CORRECTING MIS-DEPO...)

10/4/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER CORRECTING MIS-DEPO...)

Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER CORRECTING MIS-DEPOSIT OF FUNDS AND DIRECTING CREDIT TO THE CORRECT CASE; DECLARATION OFJAMESE.ADLER;MEMORANDUM OF AUTHORITIES

10/4/2019: Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER CORRECTING MIS-DEPOSIT OF FUNDS AND DIRECTING CREDIT TO THE CORRECT CASE; DECLARATION OFJAMESE.ADLER;MEMORANDUM OF AUTHORITIES

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

10/7/2019: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

3/12/2019: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Complaint - Complaint

2/13/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/13/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/13/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

2/13/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/13/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: CAPITAL TRUST ESCROW (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Order CORRECTING MISDEPOSIT OF FUNDS AND DIRECTING CREDIT TO THE CORRECT CASE: Status Date changed from 10/04/2019 to 10/04/2019; Name Extension changed from [Proposed] ORDER CORRECTING MISDEPOSIT OF FUNDS AND DIRECTING CREDIT TO THE CORRECT CASE to CORRECTING MISDEPOSIT OF FUNDS AND DIRECTING CREDIT TO THE CORRECT CASE; As To Parties changed from Theresa Moore (Defendant) to Theresa Moore (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER CORRECTING MIS-DEPO...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by CAPITAL TRUST ESCROW on 02/13/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application FOR ORDER CORRECTING MIS-DEPOSIT OF FUNDS AND DIRECTING CREDIT TO THE CORRECT CASE; DECLARATION OFJAMESE.ADLER;MEMORANDUM OF AUTHORITIES; Filed by: CAPITAL TRUST ESCROW (Plaintiff); As to: Theresa Moore (Defendant); Charlie Morris Mills (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketOrder [Proposed] ORDER CORRECTING MISDEPOSIT OF FUNDS AND DIRECTING CREDIT TO THE CORRECT CASE; Filed by: CAPITAL TRUST ESCROW (Plaintiff); As to: Theresa Moore (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketHearing on Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER CORRECTING MIS-DEPOSIT OF FUNDS AND DIRECTING CREDIT TO THE CORRECT CASE; DECLARATION OFJAMESE.ADLER;MEMORANDUM OF AUTHORITIES scheduled for 10/04/2019 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 10/04/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 11/18/2019 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 10/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Status on Disbursement of Remaining Funds in the Amount of $4,565 scheduled for 11/18/2019 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 10/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketDeclaration OF JAMES E. ADLER RE: EX PARTE NOTICE; Filed by: CAPITAL TRUST ESCROW (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 08/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: CAPITAL TRUST ESCROW (Plaintiff); As to: Charlie Morris Mills (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/12/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CAPITAL TRUST ESCROW (Plaintiff); As to: Theresa Moore (Defendant); Charlie Morris Mills (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CAPITAL TRUST ESCROW (Plaintiff); As to: Theresa Moore (Defendant); Charlie Morris Mills (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CAPITAL TRUST ESCROW (Plaintiff); As to: Theresa Moore (Defendant); Charlie Morris Mills (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAPITAL TRUST ESCROW is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADLER JAMES E