Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2019 at 01:38:46 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE VS WHITAKER, GLYNN

Case Summary

On 03/29/2017 CAPITAL ONE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WHITAKER, GLYNN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5945

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAPITAL ONE N.A.

CAPITAL ONE N. A.

Defendant

WHITAKER GLYNN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

THE MOORE LAW GROUP, APC - HARVEY M MOORE ESQ

Attorney at THE MOORE LAW GROUP, APC

MOORE HARVEY M ESQ

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement (Collection Case) - CONDITIONAL

8/25/2017: Notice of Settlement (Collection Case) - CONDITIONAL

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

9/12/2017: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Request for Dismissal

3/27/2018: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: (CAPITAL ONE) N. A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • Request for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • OSC - Hearing (name extension) scheduled for 03/13/2020 at 08:30 AM in at Department B Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 09/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • Notice of Settlement (Collection Case) CONDITIONAL; Filed by: (CAPITAL ONE) N. A. (Plaintiff); As to: GLYNN WHITAKER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • OSC - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • OSC HEARING IS SET FOR 03/13/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEB . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY THOMAS D. LONG, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR455371010. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAPITAL ONE N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOORE, HARVEY M