Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2019 at 02:00:43 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK [USA] VS TORRES, ANGEL

Case Summary

On 03/29/2017 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TORRES, ANGEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5946

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAPITAL ONE BANK [USA] N.A.

CAPITAL ONE BANK [USA] N. A.

Defendant

TORRES ANGEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

THE MOORE LAW GROUP, APC - HARVEY M MOORE ESQ

Attorney at THE MOORE LAW GROUP, APC

MOORE HARVEY M ESQ

 

Court Documents

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

9/7/2017: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/7/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

9/7/2017: Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

12/17/2018: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (SACRAMENTO)

1/10/2019: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (SACRAMENTO)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2019
  • Writ of Execution (SACRAMENTO); Issued by: (CAPITAL ONE BANK [USA]) N. A. (Plaintiff); As to: ANGEL TORRES (Defendant); County: SACRAMENTO; Principal: 3173.71; Interest: 0.00; Costs: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: (CAPITAL ONE BANK [USA]) N. A. (Plaintiff); As to: ANGEL TORRES (Defendant); Service Date: 12/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • OSC - Hearing (name extension) scheduled for 03/13/2020 at 08:30 AM in at Department B Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • Default judgment entered for Plaintiff (CAPITAL ONE BANK [USA]) N. A. against Defendant (TORRES, ANGEL) on the Complaint filed by CAPITAL ONE BANK [USA] on 03/29/2017 for the principal amount of $2,883.71 and costs of $290.00 for a total of $3,173.71.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: (CAPITAL ONE BANK [USA]) N. A. (Plaintiff); As to: ANGEL TORRES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • Default entered as to ANGEL TORRES; On the Complaint filed by CAPITAL ONE BANK [USA] on 03/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: (CAPITAL ONE BANK [USA]) N. A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (TORRES, ANGEL) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • OSC HEARING IS SET FOR 03/13/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEB . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY THOMAS D. LONG, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR455371009. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • The case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOORE, HARVEY M