Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2019 at 13:54:20 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK [USA] VS QUINONEZ, SEAN T

Case Summary

On 03/29/2017 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against QUINONEZ, SEAN T. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5948

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAPITAL ONE BANK [USA] N.A.

CAPITAL ONE BANK [USA] N. A.

Defendant

QUINONEZ SEAN T

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BLEIER & COX LLP - ELIZABETH A. BLEIER

Attorney at BLEIER & COX LLP

BLEIER ELIZABETH A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - Hearing Other scheduled for 03/13/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: (CAPITAL ONE BANK [USA]) N. A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • Request for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; GENERAL ORDER FILED. SERVED AS TO (QUINONEZ, SEAN T) SUBSERVED BY LEAVING WITH JANE DOE ON 4/23/2017 . COSTS OF $ 70.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • OSC HEARING IS SET FOR 03/13/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEB . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY THOMAS D. LONG, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR455371007. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bleier, Elizabeth A