This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 21:07:50 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N.A. VS VILLA, NICHOLAS F

Case Summary

On 08/15/2016 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VILLA, NICHOLAS F. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT J. SCHUIT. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3447

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT J. SCHUIT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N.A.

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N. A.

Defendant

VILLA NICHOLAS F

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BLEIER & COX, APC. - SAL I. PEREZ

Attorney at BLEIER & COX, APC.

PEREZ SAL I.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Firm Name - Notice of Change of Firm Name

6/26/2019: Notice of Change of Firm Name - Notice of Change of Firm Name

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

6/26/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing Other scheduled for 07/31/2019 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/27/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: (CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N. A.) (Plaintiff); As to: NICHOLAS F VILLA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- SAL I. PEREZ (Attorney): Organization Name changed from BLEIER & COX, APC. to Patenaude & Felix, A.P.C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by: (CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N. A.) (Plaintiff); New Firm Name: Patenaude & Felix, A.P.C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N. A. on 08/15/2016, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by (CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N. A.) as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO SHELF 1 RE: FILE REVIEWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • DocketOSC HEARING IS SET FOR 07/31/19 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT F43 . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY ROBERT J. SCHUIT, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO RECORDS RE: FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN CHA621919122. Filing Fee: 225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less