This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/04/2022 at 20:47:30 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VS SALVADOR E ZELAYA

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SALVADOR E ZELAYA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SHERYL M. BEASLEY. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7486

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SHERYL M. BEASLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N.A.

Defendant

ZELAYA SALVADOR E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLEIER ELIZABETH A

 

Court Documents

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/20/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration Re: Nonmilitary Status

2/20/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration Re: Nonmilitary Status

Complaint - Complaint

2/20/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

2/20/2019: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/20/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/20/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION REGARDING NON SERVICE - NON ESTES

5/30/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION REGARDING NON SERVICE - NON ESTES

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

12/26/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 02/26/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/27/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. on 02/20/2019, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Salvador E Zelaya (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketDeclaration DECLARATION REGARDING NON SERVICE - NON ESTES; Filed by: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 02/26/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Sheryl M. Beasley in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Salvador E Zelaya (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Salvador E Zelaya (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Salvador E Zelaya (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration Re: Nonmilitary Status; Filed by: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Salvador E Zelaya (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less