Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 04:01:51 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N.A. VS NORDIKYAN, AZNIV

Case Summary

On 07/19/2017 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NORDIKYAN, AZNIV. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3627

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N.A.

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N. A.

Defendant

NORDIKYAN AZNIV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

THE MOORE LAW GROUP APC - IMINDERJIT POONI

Attorney at THE MOORE LAW GROUP APC

POONI IMINDERJIT

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

10/3/2017: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

11/13/2017: Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

Declaration (name extension) - RE: STATEMENT OF CASE

11/13/2017: Declaration (name extension) - RE: STATEMENT OF CASE

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/13/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Default Judgment

11/22/2017: Default Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment

1/11/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by: (CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N. A.) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing Other scheduled for 07/06/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketDefault judgment entered for Plaintiff (CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N. A.) against Defendant (NORDIKYAN, AZNIV) on the Complaint filed by CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N. A. on 07/19/2017 for the principal amount of $3,844.24 and costs of $290.00 for a total of $4,134.24.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: (CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N. A.) (Plaintiff); As to: AZNIV NORDIKYAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketDefault entered as to AZNIV NORDIKYAN; On the Complaint filed by CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N. A. on 07/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketDeclaration RE: STATEMENT OF CASE; Filed by: (CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N. A.) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketDeclaration of Costs - CCP 1033; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: (CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N. A.) (Plaintiff); As to: AZNIV NORDIKYAN (Defendant); Service Date: 07/27/2017; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketOSC HEARING IS SET FOR 07/06/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT F43 . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY GRACIELA L. FREIXES TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO RECORDS RE: FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN CHA638681081. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Iminderjit Pooni