Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/30/2018 at 00:09:27 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VS EMAD JARABANDA

Case Summary

On 10/27/2017 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against EMAD JARABANDA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICK BROWN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7584

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICK BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N.A.

Defendant

JARABANDA EMAD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLEIER ELIZABETH ANN

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

6/21/2018: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Declaration - RE: NON MILITARY STATUS

2/9/2018: Declaration - RE: NON MILITARY STATUS

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

2/9/2018: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

2/9/2018: Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

Request for Dismissal

2/9/2018: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Change of Firm Name

2/9/2018: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/9/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Default Judgment

2/16/2018: Default Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/27/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/27/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/27/2017: Complaint

Declaration - NON MILITARY

10/27/2017: Declaration - NON MILITARY

Summons - on Complaint

10/27/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/27/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant

10/27/2017: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2018
  • Default judgment entered for Plaintiff CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. against Defendant EMAD JARABANDA on the Complaint filed by CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. on 10/27/2017 for the principal amount of $7,371.22 and costs of $295.00 for a total of $7,666.22.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Default Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 10/29/2018 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Notice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. (Plaintiff); New Firm Name: PATENAUDE & FELIX, APC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1-5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • On the Complaint filed by CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. on 10/27/2017, Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to , Does 1-5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Declaration RE: NON MILITARY STATUS; Filed by: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: EMAD JARABANDA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/27/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: EMAD JARABANDA (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/21/2017; Service Cost: 70.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Rick Brown in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 10/29/2018 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: EMAD JARABANDA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • The case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Declaration NON MILITARY; Filed by: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bleier, Elizabeth A