This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/15/2019 at 14:29:56 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. VS AREVALOZ, MARIA C

Case Summary

On 02/22/2012 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AREVALOZ, MARIA C. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, San Pedro Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0219

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Pedro Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A.

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N.A.

Defendant

AREVALOZ MARIA C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

BOULANGER, MICHAEL R.

BOULANGER MICHAEL R.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2012
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2012
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2012
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2012
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED AS TO DOES 1 TO 15 ONLY. REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED AS TO DOES 1 TO 15 ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2012
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2012
  • SUBMISSION FOR CLERK'S CIVIL JUDGMENT PENDING*** DEFAULT PROCESSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2012
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT - $44.00 - REDUCED FILING FEE TO FULL FILING FEE PAID. CIVIL DEPOSIT - $44.00 - REDUCED FILING FEE TO FULL FILING FEE PAID.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2012
  • OSC SET 08/27/12, 0830 AM, DEPT. 87, NOTICE FILED & MAILED * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED - COLLECTION CASE Filing Fee: 181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2012
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2012
  • DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES (CAL BUS & PROF CODE SS 6322.1 DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES (CAL BUS & PROF CODE SS 6322.1 (C)(1)) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.