This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/22/2016 at 09:31:42 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N A VS MANZONI, GUILLERMO O

Case Summary

On 02/21/2012 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MANZONI, GUILLERMO O. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2645

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Los Angeles Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N A

Defendant

MANZONI GUILLERMO O

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE MOORE LAW GROUP A PROF CORP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2013
  • CASE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO G C 68152 D(1) & D(2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2012
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2012
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE-ENTIRE ACTION, FILED & ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2012
  • DEC OF NON SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2012
  • DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2012
  • OSC SET 08/24/12, 0830 AM, DEPT. 77, NOTICE FILED & MAILED * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED - COLLECTION CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2012
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less