This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/24/2021 at 20:42:55 (UTC).

CAPITAL CREDITS GROUP, LLC VS RAMESH ARORA, MEDICAL CORP.

Case Summary

On 11/12/2020 CAPITAL CREDITS GROUP, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RAMESH ARORA, MEDICAL CORP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2587

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL CREDITS GROUP LLC

Defendant

RAMESH ARORA MEDICAL CORP.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

12/23/2020: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

1/14/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/14/2021

1/14/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/14/2021

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

11/12/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/14/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Capital Credits Group, LLC on 11/12/2020, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 01/14/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Capital Credits Group, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Ramesh Arora, Medical Corp. (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 12/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Capital Credits Group, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Capital Credits Group, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Ramesh Arora, Medical Corp. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketCase assigned in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAPITAL CREDITS GROUPS LLC DBA THE ENTERPRISE ZONE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant