This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/11/2021 at 09:16:36 (UTC).

CAPITAL CREDITS GROUP, LLC VS PSSI GLOBAL SERVICES, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/13/2020 CAPITAL CREDITS GROUP, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PSSI GLOBAL SERVICES, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8670

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL CREDITS GROUP LLC DBA THE ENTERPRISE ZONE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant

PSSI GLOBAL SERVICES LLC A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREEN VINCENT S.

Defendant Attorney

KALLBERG KEVIN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/13/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

10/13/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/13/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/13/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

10/13/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/5/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer - Answer

12/16/2020: Answer - Answer

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

4/19/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

4/16/2021: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Capital Credits Group, LLC on 10/13/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Capital Credits Group, LLC as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Capital Credits Group, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: PSSI Global Services, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/19/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/19/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: PSSI Global Services, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Capital Credits Group, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: PSSI Global Services, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/29/2020; Service Cost: 291.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Capital Credits Group, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: PSSI Global Services, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Capital Credits Group, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: PSSI Global Services, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Capital Credits Group, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: PSSI Global Services, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less