This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/26/2021 at 05:50:02 (UTC).

CAPITAL CREDITS GROUP, LLC VS MICHEL CORDON BLEU, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 CAPITAL CREDITS GROUP, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MICHEL CORDON BLEU, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8704

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL CREDITS GROUP LLC DBA THE ENTERPRISE ZONE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

MICHEL CORDON BLEU INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BLANCHET MICHEL G.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TAMIR ROTEM

Defendant Attorney

GUTTMAN BRUCE J

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/14/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/14/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

10/14/2020: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

10/14/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/14/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/23/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/8/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

11/25/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

11/25/2020: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice

11/25/2020: Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/16/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

2/16/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

1/29/2021: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

1/25/2021: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for 03/01/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/17/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/17/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/17/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: CAPITAL CREDITS GROUP, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: MICHEL CORDON BLEU, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/07/2021; Service Cost: 104.25; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by CAPITAL CREDITS GROUP, LLC on 10/14/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by CAPITAL CREDITS GROUP, LLC as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketAddress for Rotem Tamir (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: CAPITAL CREDITS GROUP, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: MICHEL CORDON BLEU, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); MICHEL G. BLANCHET (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for 03/01/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for 02/18/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 03/01/2021 10:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Bruce J Guttman (Attorney): First Name changed from BRUCE to Bruce; Last Name changed from GUTTMAN to Guttman; Middle Name changed from J. to J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: MICHEL G. BLANCHET (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: CAPITAL CREDITS GROUP, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: MICHEL G. BLANCHET (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/21/2020; Service Cost: 176.25; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CAPITAL CREDITS GROUP, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: MICHEL CORDON BLEU, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); MICHEL G. BLANCHET (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CAPITAL CREDITS GROUP, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: MICHEL CORDON BLEU, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); MICHEL G. BLANCHET (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CAPITAL CREDITS GROUP, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: MICHEL CORDON BLEU, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); MICHEL G. BLANCHET (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less