This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/25/2021 at 12:09:26 (UTC).

CAPITAL CREDITS GROUP, LLC VS MELENDREZ ASSOCIATES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/27/2020 CAPITAL CREDITS GROUP, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MELENDREZ ASSOCIATES, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9077

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL CREDITS GROUP LLC DBA THE ENTERPRISE ZONE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

MELENDREZ ASSOCIATES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BAKER SCOTT

LARLEE ROBERT

SMITH CRAIG

RELM INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TAMIR ROTEM

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/27/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

10/27/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/27/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/27/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

10/27/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/18/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/2/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/2/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/2/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/2/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/1/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

3/23/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

3/23/2021: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/05/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/05/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: Capital Credits Group, LLC (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Capital Credits Group, LLC on 10/27/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Capital Credits Group, LLC as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Capital Credits Group, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Craig Smith (Defendant); Service Date: 12/12/2020; Service Cost: 190.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Capital Credits Group, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Scott Baker (Defendant); Service Date: 11/02/2020; Service Cost: 52.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Capital Credits Group, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Melendrez Associates, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 11/02/2020; Service Cost: 75.75; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Capital Credits Group, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Robert Larlee (Defendant); Service Date: 11/14/2020; Service Cost: 155.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Capital Credits Group, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: RELM, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 11/02/2020; Service Cost: 52.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Capital Credits Group, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Robert Larlee (Defendant); Service Date: 11/11/2020; Service Cost: 155.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Capital Credits Group, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Melendrez Associates, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); RELM, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Robert Larlee (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Capital Credits Group, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Melendrez Associates, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); RELM, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Robert Larlee (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Capital Credits Group, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Melendrez Associates, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); RELM, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Robert Larlee (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less